Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Angel Alemán Eslava, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Río Gallegos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1922BornBuenos Aires
26 Oct 195028.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
8 Apr 196845.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Viedma, Argentina
8 Apr 196845.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Puppi
29 Jun 196845.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Puppi
5 Apr 197552.5AppointedBishop of Río Gallegos, Argentina
11 Mar 199269.4DiedBishop of Río Gallegos, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Miguel Angel Alemán Eslava:
Bishop Miguel Angel Alemán Eslava S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Río Gallegos

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013