Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro María Laxague

Bishop of Zárate-Campana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1952 BornCoronel Pringles
15 Jul 198936.8Ordained PriestPriest of Bahía Blanca, Argentina
14 Nov 200654.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bahía Blanca, Argentina
14 Nov 200654.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Castra Severiana
21 Dec 200654.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castra Severiana
3 Nov 201563.1AppointedBishop of Zárate-Campana, Argentina
19 Dec 201563.2InstalledBishop of Zárate-Campana, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Pedro María Laxague:
Bishop Pedro María Laxague (born ) Bishop of Zárate-Campana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Zárate-Campana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,301
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Nov 2015
  • c1: CB, 3 Nov 2015
  • i: CB, 18 Dec 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 19 Dec 2015