Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Marie-Edouard de Metz-Noblat

Bishop of Langres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1959 BornCherbourg
28 May 198728.3Ordained PriestPriest of Verdun, France
21 Jan 201455.0AppointedBishop of Langres, France
16 Mar 201455.1Ordained BishopBishop of Langres, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Marie-Edouard de Metz-Noblat:
Bishop Joseph-Marie-Edouard de Metz-Noblat (born ) Bishop of Langres

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Langres.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Jan 2014
  • ob: CB, 21 Jan 2014
  • c2+: CB, 27 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014