Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Paul Gabriel Émile Gusching

Bishop of Verdun


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1955 BornNeuville Coppegueule
19 Jun 198328.0Ordained PriestPriest of Amiens, France
3 Jul 201459.0AppointedBishop of Verdun, France
21 Sep 201459.2Ordained BishopBishop of Verdun, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Paul Gabriel Émile Gusching:
Bishop Jean-Paul Gabriel Émile Gusching (born ) Bishop of Verdun

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Verdun.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2014
  • ob: CB, 3 Jul 2014
  • c2+: CB, 2 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,287
  • mns: CB, 17 Dec 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014