Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor Selvino Arenhart

Deceased

Bishop of Oberá, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1948Born
5 Mar 197728.2Ordained PriestPriest of Posadas, Argentina
13 Jun 200960.4AppointedBishop of Oberá, Argentina
15 Aug 200960.6Ordained BishopBishop of Oberá, Argentina
17 May 201061.4DiedBishop of Oberá, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Victor Selvino Arenhart
Bishop Victor Selvino Arenhart (born , died ) Bishop of Oberá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCampo Grande

  • a priest for 33.1 years
  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,259
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018