Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mario Cardinal Nasalli Rocca di Corneliano

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Battista Decollato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1903BornPiecenza
9 Apr 192723.6Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
11 Apr 196965.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Antium
20 Apr 196965.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Antium
28 Apr 196965.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giovanni Battista Decollato
28 Apr 196965.7Elevated to Cardinal
30 Jun 197975.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Battista Decollato
9 Nov 198885.2DiedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Battista Decollato

MicroData Summary for Mario Nasalli Rocca di Corneliano:
Mario Cardinal Nasalli Rocca di Corneliano (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Battista Decollato

  • a priest for 61.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
  • a cardinal for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014