Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Henri de Rochefort d’Ally

Deceased

Bishop of Chalons-sur-Saône


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1710Born
1 Apr 175444.3AppointedBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France
18 Apr 175444.3Ordained BishopBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France
13 Jun 177262.4DiedBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Henri de Rochefort d’Ally:
Bishop Louis-Henri de Rochefort d’Ally (died ) Bishop of Chalons-sur-Saône

  • a bishop for 18.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013