Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Gabriel d’Agay

Deceased

Bishop of Perpignan-Elne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1731BornBesançon
18 Jul 177948.3SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
20 Sep 177948.5ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
20 Sep 177948.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Canopus
30 Jan 178048.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canopus
1 Mar 178351.9SucceededBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
28 Aug 178857.4DiedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Gabriel d’Agay:
Bishop Jean-Gabriel d’Agay (born , died ) Bishop of Perpignan-Elne

  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 145, and Page 206
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015