Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Basil Roper

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Toowoomba

Titular Bishop of Elusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1888BornWarrnambool
30 Nov 191123.6Ordained PriestPriest of Ballarat, Australia
13 Jul 193850.3AppointedBishop of Toowoomba, Australia
28 Oct 193850.6Ordained BishopBishop of Toowoomba, Australia
20 Nov 193850.6InstalledBishop of Toowoomba, Australia
14 Oct 195264.5ResignedBishop of Toowoomba, Australia
14 Oct 195264.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Elusa
28 Jul 196476.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Toowoomba, Australia

MicroData Summary for Joseph Basil Roper:
Bishop Joseph Basil Roper (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Toowoomba

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015