Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Foley

Deceased

Bishop of Ballarat, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1865Born
8 Dec 188924.8Ordained PriestPriest of Cloyne, Ireland
28 Apr 191651.2AppointedBishop of Ballarat, Australia
24 Aug 191651.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ballarat, Australia
31 Oct 194176.7DiedBishop of Ballarat, Australia

MicroData Summary for Daniel Foley
Bishop Daniel Foley (born , died ) Bishop of Ballarat

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNewtown, Ballyhea, Charleville, Ireland

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 38
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast