Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pauly Kannookadan

Bishop of Irinjalakuda (Syro-Malabarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1961 BornKuzhikattussery
28 Dec 198524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Irinjalakuda (Syro-Malabarese), India
15 Jan 201048.1AppointedBishop of Irinjalakuda (Syro-Malabarese), India
18 Apr 201048.3Ordained BishopBishop of Irinjalakuda (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for Pauly Kannookadan:
Bishop Pauly Kannookadan (born ) Bishop of Irinjalakuda

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Irinjalakuda (Syro-Malabarese).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,627

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 19 Sep 2014