Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Alappatt

Bishop of Ramanathapuram (Syro-Malabar), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1962 Born
27 Dec 198725.6Ordained PriestPriest of Trichur (Syro-Malabar), India
18 Jan 201047.7AppointedBishop of Ramanathapuram (Syro-Malabar), India
11 Apr 201047.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ramanathapuram (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for Paul Alappatt (VIAF: 51006583)
Bishop Paul Alappatt (born ) Bishop of Ramanathapuram

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEdathuruthy

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Ramanathapuram (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,620

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast