Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas George Doran

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rockford, Illinois


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1936BornRockford
20 Dec 196125.8Ordained PriestPriest of Rockford, Illinois, USA
19 Apr 199458.1AppointedBishop of Rockford, Illinois, USA
24 Jun 199458.3Ordained BishopBishop of Rockford, Illinois, USA
20 Mar 201276.0RetiredBishop of Rockford, Illinois, USA
1 Sep 201680.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Rockford, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas George Doran (VIAF: 315946415)
Bishop Thomas George Doran (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rockford

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,328
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab/i: Website of the Diocese, 4 Dec 2011
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Mar 2012
  • d: CB, 1 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 2 Sep 2016