Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Patrick Maginnis

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania

Titular Bishop of Siminina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1933 BornPhiladelphia
13 May 196127.4Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
24 Jan 199662.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
24 Jan 199662.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Siminina
11 Mar 199662.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Siminina
8 Jun 201076.5RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Patrick Maginnis:
Bishop Robert Patrick Maginnis (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Philadelphia

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Philadelphia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,695
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013