Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Robert Cistone

Deceased

Bishop of Saginaw, Michigan, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1949Born
17 May 197525.9Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
8 Jun 200455.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
8 Jun 200455.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Casae Medianae
28 Jul 200455.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Casae Medianae
20 May 200960.0AppointedBishop of Saginaw, Michigan, USA
28 Jul 200960.1InstalledBishop of Saginaw, Michigan, USA
16 Oct 201869.4DiedBishop of Saginaw, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Robert Cistone
Bishop Joseph Robert Cistone (born , died ) Bishop of Saginaw

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhiladelphia, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopSaints Peter and Paul, Cathedral Basilica, Philadelphia, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania
Death PlaceSagniw, Diocese of Saginaw, Michigan

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,662
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 May 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 16 Oct 2018

Quantcast