Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Francis Burbidge

Bishop of Arlington, Virginia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1957 BornPhiladelphia
19 May 198426.9Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
21 Jun 200245.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
21 Jun 200245.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Cluain Iraird
5 Sep 200245.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cluain Iraird
8 Jun 200648.9AppointedBishop of Raleigh, North Carolina, USA
4 Aug 200649.1InstalledBishop of Raleigh, North Carolina, USA
4 Oct 201659.3AppointedBishop of Arlington, Virginia, USA
6 Dec 201659.4InstalledBishop of Arlington, Virginia, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael Francis Burbidge (VIAF: 314816063)
Bishop Michael Francis Burbidge (born ) Bishop of Arlington

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Arlington.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,246
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Oct 2016
  • i: CB, 4 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 Oct 2016