Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Peter Cullen

Bishop Emeritus of Allentown, Pennsylvania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1933 BornPhiladelphia
23 Sep 196128.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
19 May 196229.1Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
8 Feb 199460.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
8 Feb 199460.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Paria in Proconsolare
14 Apr 199461.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paria in Proconsolare
16 Dec 199764.7AppointedBishop of Allentown, Pennsylvania, USA
9 Feb 199864.9InstalledBishop of Allentown, Pennsylvania, USA
27 May 200976.1RetiredBishop of Allentown, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Peter Cullen:
Bishop Edward Peter Cullen (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Allentown

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Allentown.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 27 May 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,314
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015