Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Bydolek

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim

Titular Bishop of Limisa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1888BornHannover-Linden
16 Oct 191527.7Ordained PriestPriest of Hildesheim, Germany
10 Sep 194961.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany
10 Sep 194961.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Limisa
21 Sep 194961.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Limisa
18 Oct 195769.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Bydolek:
Bishop Johannes Bydolek (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013