Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arthur Luysterman

Bishop Emeritus of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1932 Born
26 Aug 195624.4Ordained PriestPriest of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
13 Jul 199058.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
21 Oct 199058.5Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
27 Dec 199159.7SucceededBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
19 Dec 200371.7ResignedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

MicroData Summary
Arthur Luysterman
Bishop Arthur Luysterman
(born )
Bishop Emeritus of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMeerbeke

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gent {Ghent, Gand}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,192

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025