Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gustaaf Cardinal Joos

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Pier Damiani ai Monti di San Paolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1923BornSint-Niklaas, Belgium
28 Apr 194622.8Ordained PriestPriest of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
7 Oct 200380.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ypres
11 Oct 200380.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ypres
21 Oct 200380.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Pier Damiani ai Monti di San Paolo
21 Oct 200380.3Elevated to Cardinal
2 Nov 200481.3DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Pier Damiani ai Monti di San Paolo

MicroData Summary for Gustaaf Joos:
Cardinal Gustaaf Joos (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Pier Damiani ai Monti di San Paolo

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 1.1 years
  • a cardinal for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,472
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013