Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Huard

Deceased

Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1928BornBoussu
27 Dec 195325.8Ordained PriestPriest of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
2 Jul 197749.3AppointedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
25 Sep 197749.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
4 Oct 200274.5DiedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Jean Huard:
Bishop Jean Huard (born , died ) Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2003, Page 1,068

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013