Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Van den Berghe

Bishop Emeritus of Antwerpen {Antwerp}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1933 Born
15 Jun 195724.4Ordained PriestPriest of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
3 Jul 198047.4AppointedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp}, Belgium
7 Sep 198047.6Ordained BishopBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp}, Belgium
28 Oct 200875.8RetiredBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Paul Van den Berghe
Bishop Paul Van den Berghe (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Antwerpen {Antwerp}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGeraardsbergen

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Antwerpen {Antwerp}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Oct 2008

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast