Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucas Van Looy, S.D.B.

Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1941 BornTielen
6 Mar 196826.4ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
12 Sep 197029.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
19 Dec 200362.2AppointedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
1 Feb 200462.3Ordained BishopBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Lucas Van Looy:
Bishop Lucas Van Looy S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gent {Ghent, Gand}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,522

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013