Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David William Bacon

Deceased

Bishop of Portland, Maine, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1813Born
13 Dec 183825.2Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
23 Jan 185541.3AppointedBishop of Portland, Maine, USA
22 Apr 185541.6Ordained BishopBishop of Portland, Maine, USA
31 May 185541.7InstalledBishop of Portland, Maine, USA
5 Nov 187461.1DiedBishop of Portland, Maine, USA

MicroData Summary for David William Bacon
Bishop David William Bacon (born , died ) Bishop of Portland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, NY, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Ordained PriestBaltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick's, Cathedral, New York, NY, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Death PlaceNew York, NY, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Buried Place (Original)Immaculate Conception, Cathedral, Portland, Diocese of Portland, Maine

  • a priest for 35.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 463
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 19 Jul 2018

Quantcast