Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis McNeirny

Deceased

Bishop of Albany, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1828Born
17 Aug 185426.3Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
22 Dec 187143.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Albany, New York, USA
22 Dec 187143.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhesaina
21 Apr 187243.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhesaina
12 Oct 187749.4SucceededBishop of Albany, New York, USA
2 Jan 189465.6DiedBishop of Albany, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis McNeirny
Bishop Francis McNeirny (born , died ) Bishop of Albany

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Ordained Bishop(Mott Street), Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 85, and Page 481
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Mar 2017