Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sarat Chandra Nayak

Bishop of Berhampur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1957 BornKerubadi
25 Apr 199032.8Ordained PriestPriest of Cuttack-Bhubaneswar, India
27 Nov 200649.4AppointedBishop of Berhampur, India
30 Jan 200749.6Ordained BishopBishop of Berhampur, India

MicroData Summary for Sarat Chandra Nayak:
Bishop Sarat Chandra Nayak (born ) Bishop of Berhampur

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Berhampur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Nov 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,328

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013