Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raphy Manjaly

Bishop of Allahabad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1958 BornVendere
11 May 198325.3Ordained PriestPriest of Trichur (Syro-Malabarese), India
198425.9IncardinatedPriest of Agra, India
24 Feb 200749.0AppointedBishop of Varanasi, India
30 Apr 200749.2Ordained BishopBishop of Varanasi, India
17 Oct 201355.7AppointedBishop of Allahabad, India
3 Dec 201355.8InstalledBishop of Allahabad, India

MicroData Summary for Raphy Manjaly:
Bishop Raphy Manjaly (born ) Bishop of Allahabad

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Allahabad.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Feb 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,412
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Oct 2013
  • i: CB, 6 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 6 Nov 2013