Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Alwyn Fernandes Barreto

Bishop of Sindhudurg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1952 BornGoa-Daman
13 Oct 197926.8Ordained PriestPriest of Poona, India
5 Jul 200552.5AppointedBishop of Sindhudurg, India
5 Oct 200552.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sindhudurg, India

MicroData Summary for Anthony Alwyn Fernandes Barreto:
Bishop Anthony Alwyn Fernandes Barreto (born ) Bishop of Sindhudurg

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sindhudurg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 14,996

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013