Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Yvon Ambroise

Bishop of Tuticorin, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1942 Born
23 Dec 196725.3Ordained PriestPriest of Pondicherry and Cuddalore, India
1 Apr 200562.5AppointedBishop of Tuticorin, India
18 May 200562.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tuticorin, India

MicroData Summary for Yvon Ambroise
Bishop Yvon Ambroise (born ) Bishop of Tuticorin

EventPlace
Birth PlacePondicherry

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tuticorin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,892

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast