Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Francis Sharma, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nepal

Titular Bishop of Gigthi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1937BornKathmandu
4 May 196830.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
9 Apr 198446.3AppointedSuperior of Nepal
8 Nov 199658.9AppointedPrefect of Nepal
10 Feb 200769.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nepal
10 Feb 200769.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Gigthi
5 May 200769.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gigthi
25 Apr 201476.3RetiredVicar Apostolic of Nepal
8 Dec 201577.9DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nepal

MicroData Summary for Anthony Francis Sharma:
Bishop Anthony Francis Sharma S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nepal

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2007
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,417
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 9 Dec 2015