Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Luis Henao Cadavid

Bishop of Líbano-Honda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1954 BornAndes
15 Dec 197925.6Ordained PriestPriest of Jericó, Colombia
17 Oct 201561.5AppointedBishop of Líbano-Honda, Colombia
21 Nov 201561.6Ordained BishopBishop of Líbano-Honda, Colombia
5 Dec 201561.6InstalledBishop of Líbano-Honda, Colombia

MicroData Summary for José Luis Henao Cadavid
Bishop José Luis Henao Cadavid (born ) Bishop of Líbano-Honda

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Líbano-Honda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Oct 2015
  • ob/i: CB, 18 Oct 2015
  • i: CB, 20 Oct 2015
  • c23: CB, 22 Nov 2015
  • c4: CB, 24 Nov 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,674

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Feb 2016