Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Louis-Simon Lemercier

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Beauvais, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1758Born
25 May 178224.1Ordained PriestPriest
18 Sep 183274.4SelectedBishop of Beauvais, France
17 Dec 183274.6ConfirmedBishop of Beauvais, France
10 Feb 183374.8Ordained BishopBishop of Beauvais, France
28 Dec 183779.7RetiredBishop of Beauvais, France
27 May 184385.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Beauvais, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Louis-Simon Lemercier
Bishop Jean-Louis-Simon Lemercier (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Beauvais

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeauvais

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 109
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,833, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast