Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Joseph Legraive

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mechelen, Belgium

Titular Bishop of Parnassus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1858Born
19 Sep 188526.7Ordained PriestPriest of Mechelen, Belgium
16 Oct 190748.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen, Belgium
16 Oct 190748.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Parnassus
17 Nov 190748.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Parnassus
10 Jun 194081.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Louis Joseph Legraive
Bishop Louis Joseph Legraive (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mechelen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOhain

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,907, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast