Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léon-Paul Classe, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Ruanda

Titular Bishop of Maxula Prates


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1874Born
31 Mar 190025.7Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
10 Apr 192247.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ruanda
26 Apr 192247.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Maxula Prates
28 May 192247.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maxula Prates
31 Jan 194570.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Ruanda

MicroData Summary for Léon-Paul Classe
Bishop Léon-Paul Classe M. Afr. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Ruanda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMetz, Diocese of Metz, France

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast