Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Victor-Jean-Joseph-Marie van den Branden de Reeth

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mechelen

Titular Archbishop of Tyrus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1841BornMalines
24 Sep 186423.5Ordained PriestPriest of Mechelen, Belgium
14 Nov 187938.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen, Belgium
14 Nov 187938.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Erythrum
7 Dec 187938.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Erythrum
4 Dec 189756.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
27 Feb 190967.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Victor-Jean-Joseph-Marie van den Branden de Reeth:
Archbishop Victor-Jean-Joseph-Marie van den Branden de Reeth (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mechelen

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 262, and Page 574
  • c2+: Google Books

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 10 Jan 2014