Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amédée Marie Léon Crooy (Crooij)

Deceased

Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1869BornIxelles-Bruxelles
20 Sep 189122.6Ordained PriestPriest of Mechelen, Belgium
6 Dec 191546.9AppointedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
9 Jan 191646.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
27 Nov 192354.8DiedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Amédée Marie Léon Crooy (Crooij):
Bishop Amédée Marie Léon Crooy (Crooij) (born , died ) Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

  • a priest for 32.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1925
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 372
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 29 Sep 2013