Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilles de Böck (Boeck), C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Lisala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Titular Bishop of Azotus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1875Born
8 Sep 189519.8ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
1 Jul 190024.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
4 Jan 192145.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nouvelle-Anvers, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
10 Mar 192145.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Azotus
8 May 192145.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Azotus
27 Jan 193660.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Lisala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
20 Dec 194469.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Lisala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Gilles de Böck (Boeck)
Bishop Gilles de Böck (Boeck) C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Lisala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOppuers

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 29
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast