Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugène Victor Marie van Rechem

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

Titular Bishop of Carpasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1858BornBevere-les-Audenarde
18 Dec 188123.6Ordained PriestPriest of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
26 Mar 191455.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
26 Mar 191455.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Carpasia
17 May 191456.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carpasia
21 Aug 194385.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Eugène Victor Marie van Rechem:
Bishop Eugène Victor Marie van Rechem (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

  • a priest for 61.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015