Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis de La Vergne-Montenard de Tressan

Deceased

Archbishop of Rouen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1670¹BornTressan
2 Oct 171747.7SelectedBishop of Nantes, France
8 Jun 171848.4ConfirmedBishop of Nantes, France
10 Jul 171848.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nantes, France
27 Oct 172353.8SelectedArchbishop of Rouen, France
14 Feb 172454.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Rouen, France
18 Apr 173363.2DiedArchbishop of Rouen, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis de La Vergne-Montenard de Tressan:
Archbishop Louis de La Vergne-Montenard de Tressan (born 1670, died ) Archbishop of Rouen

  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 279, and Page 336
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 2 Sep 2015