Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles-Maurice Le Tellier

Deceased

Archbishop of Reims


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1642BornTurino
8 Jul 166825.9SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Reims, France
3 Sep 166826.1ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Reims, France
3 Sep 166826.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
11 Nov 166826.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
3 Aug 167129.0SucceededArchbishop of Reims, France
22 Feb 171067.5DiedArchbishop of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Maurice Le Tellier:
Archbishop Charles-Maurice Le Tellier (born , died ) Archbishop of Reims

  • a bishop for 41.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 283, and Page 332
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 22 Jun 2015