Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Olivier Jégou de Kervilio

Deceased

Bishop of Tréguier


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1643¹BornRaule, France
29 May 169451.4SelectedBishop of Tréguier, France
30 Aug 169451.6ConfirmedBishop of Tréguier, France
3 Oct 169451.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tréguier, France
2 Aug 173188.5DiedBishop of Tréguier, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Olivier Jégou de Kervilio:
Bishop Olivier Jégou de Kervilio (born 1643, died ) Bishop of Tréguier

  • a bishop for 36.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 387
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 2 Sep 2015