Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Guillaume de La Vieuxville-Pourpris

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Brieuc, France


Events

DateEventTitle
28 May 1721AppointedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
6 Jul 1721Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
4 Sep 1727DiedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Guillaume de La Vieuxville-Pourpris
Bishop Pierre-Guillaume de La Vieuxville-Pourpris (died ) Bishop of Saint-Brieuc

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Malo

  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 127
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast