Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Lastic de Saint-Jal

Deceased

Bishop of Castres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1694¹BornSaint Jal
1722¹28.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Nov 172834.9SelectedBishop of Uzés, France
3 Mar 172935.1ConfirmedBishop of Uzés, France
3 Apr 172935.2Ordained BishopBishop of Uzés, France
7 Sep 173642.6SelectedBishop of Castres, France
17 Nov 173642.8ResignedBishop of Uzés, France
11 Feb 173743.1ConfirmedBishop of Castres, France
24 May 175258.3DiedBishop of Castres, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François de Lastic de Saint-Jal:
Bishop François de Lastic de Saint-Jal (born 1694, died ) Bishop of Castres

  • a priest for 30.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 400
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 154
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015