Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Grégoire III (Loutfi) Laham, B.S.

Patriarch Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1933 Born
15 Aug 194915.6Simple VowsMember of Arrouhbaniat Albassiliat Almoukhalissiat (Melkite Greek)
20 Jan 195218.0Perpetual VowsMember of Arrouhbaniat Albassiliat Almoukhalissiat (Melkite Greek)
15 Feb 195925.1Ordained PriestPriest of Arrouhbaniat Albassiliat Almoukhalissiat (Melkite Greek)
1975²41.0AppointedPatriarchal Vicar of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Melkite Greek), Palestine
9 Sep 198147.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus dei Greco-Melkiti
27 Nov 198147.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tarsus dei Greco-Melkiti
1992²58.0AppointedPatriarchal Exarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Melkite Greek), Palestine
1998²64.0AppointedProtosyncellus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Melkite Greek), Palestine
29 Nov 200066.9SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
29 Nov 200066.9SelectedBishop of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
5 Dec 200066.9ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
5 Dec 200066.9ConfirmedBishop of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
6 May 201783.3RetiredPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
6 May 201783.3RetiredBishop of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Grégoire III (Loutfi) Laham
Patriarch Grégoire III (Loutfi) Laham B.S. (born ) Patriarch Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDaraya, Archdiocese of Damas (Melkite Greek)

Please contact the Patriarch through the Patriarchate of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 6 May 2017
  • simp/c1: CB, 11 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Jul 2017