Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Gébara

Archbishop of Petra e Filadelfia (Melkite Greek), Jordan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1965 Born
10 Jul 199328.0Ordained PriestPriest of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
31 Oct 201348.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nossa Senhora do Paraíso em São Paulo (Melkite Greek), Sao Paulo, Brazil
21 Dec 201348.5Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Nossa Senhora do Paraíso em São Paulo (Melkite Greek), Sao Paulo, Brazil
21 Jul 201449.1SucceededBishop of Nossa Senhora do Paraíso em São Paulo (Melkite Greek), Sao Paulo, Brazil
9 Feb 201852.6SelectedArchbishop of Petra e Filadelfia (Melkite Greek), Jordan
20 Feb 201852.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Petra e Filadelfia (Melkite Greek), Jordan

MicroData Summary for Joseph Gébara (VIAF: 211115140)
Archbishop Joseph Gébara (born ) Archbishop of Petra e Filadelfia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmatour, Lebanon
Ordained BishopNotre Dame de l’Annonciation, Church, Raboué

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Petra e Filadelfia (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2013
  • ob/c2: CB, 16 Dec 2013
  • c34: CB, 21 Dec 2013
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2013, Number 163
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,999
  • s: Bollettino, 21 Jul 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 5 Mar 2018