Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Cyril VII (François) Siaj (Siage)

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek)

Bishop of Damas (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateEventTitle
1763¹AppointedBishop of Bosra (Melkite Greek), Syria
23 Dec 1763³Ordained BishopBishop of Bosra (Melkite Greek), Syria
11 Dec 1794SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
11 Dec 1794SelectedBishop of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
27 Jun 1796ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
27 Jun 1796ConfirmedBishop of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
6 Aug 1796DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cyril VII (François) Siaj (Siage)
Patriarch Cyril VII (François) Siaj (Siage) (died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,131
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 29 Feb 2016