Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Abdo Arbach, B.C.

Archbishop of Homs (-Hama-Jabrud) (Melkite Greek), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1952 Born
25 Jul 196614.0ProfessedMember of Basilian Chouerite Order of Saint John the Baptist (Melkite Greek)
8 May 197724.8Solemn VowsMember of Basilian Chouerite Order of Saint John the Baptist (Melkite Greek)
24 Aug 198028.1Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Chouerite Order of Saint John the Baptist (Melkite Greek)
17 Oct 200654.3AppointedApostolic Exarch of Argentina (Melkite Greek)
17 Oct 200654.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Hilta
11 Nov 200654.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Palmyra dei Greco-Melkiti
3 Feb 200754.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Palmyra dei Greco-Melkiti
4 Mar 200754.6InstalledApostolic Exarch of Argentina (Melkite Greek)
23 Jun 201259.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Homs (-Hama-Jabrud) (Melkite Greek), Syria

MicroData Summary for Jean-Abdo Arbach
Archbishop Jean-Abdo Arbach B.C. (born ) Archbishop of Homs (-Hama-Jabrud)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYabroud

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Homs (-Hama-Jabrud) (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Oct 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,329
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Jun 2012
  • i: CB, 8 Oct 2015
  • prof/sole: CB, 19 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jul 2017