Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ibrahim Salameh, S.M.S.P.

Apostolic Exarch of Argentina (Melkite Greek)

Titular Bishop of Palmyra dei Greco-Melkiti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1945 BornMarmarita, Syria
13 Jul 197529.6Ordained PriestPriest of Società dei Missionari di San Paolo (Melkite Greek)
15 Aug 201367.7AppointedApostolic Exarch of Argentina (Melkite Greek)
15 Aug 201367.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Palmyra dei Greco-Melkiti
27 Sep 201367.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Palmyra dei Greco-Melkiti

MicroData Summary for Ibrahim Salameh:
Bishop Ibrahim Salameh S.M.S.P. (born ) Apostolic Exarch of Argentina

Please contact the Bishop through the Apostolic Exarchate of Argentina (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Aug 2013
  • ob/c2+: CB, 27 Sep 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,882

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 19 Jan 2014