Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Rabbat

Bishop of Saint Michael’s of Sydney (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1960 BornBeirut, Lebanon
22 Dec 199434.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jun 201151.3AppointedBishop of Saint Michael’s of Sydney (Melkite Greek), Australia
16 Sep 201151.6Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Michael’s of Sydney (Melkite Greek), Australia

MicroData Summary for Robert Rabbat:
Bishop Robert Rabbat (born ) Bishop of Saint Michael’s of Sydney

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Saint Michael’s of Sydney (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2011
  • ob: CB, 26 Jul 2011
  • op: CB, 27 Aug 2011
  • c2+: CB, 7 Sep 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,142

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013