Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Grégoire II Youssef

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek)

Bishop of Damas (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1823BornRosette, Egypt
11 Jun 185430.6Ordained PriestPriest
13 Nov 185633.0Ordained BishopBishop of Akka (Melkite Greek), Israel
1 Oct 186440.9SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
1 Oct 186440.9SelectedBishop of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
27 Mar 186541.4ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
27 Mar 186541.4ConfirmedBishop of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
13 Jul 189773.7DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria

MicroData Summary for Grégoire II Youssef:
Patriarch Grégoire II Youssef (born , died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 108

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 6 Sep 2014